04/05/2011 | File Number 392 | |||
04/05/2011 | House Calendar Number 240 | |||
04/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/03/2011 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |