|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-208
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
File Number 775
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 473
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5906
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 554
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
House Calendar Number 339
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|