|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-246
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 654
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8389
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
File Number 790
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Calendar Number 477
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/31
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|