Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06528 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6528
2-January Session, 2011 *_____HB06528CE____031711____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6528
2+January Session, 2011 LCO No. 3899
3+ *03899_______CE_*
4+Referred to Committee on Commerce
5+Introduced by:
6+(CE)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 6528
10+Raised Bill No. 6528
711
812 January Session, 2011
913
10-*_____HB06528CE____031711____*
14+LCO No. 3899
15+
16+*03899_______CE_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on Commerce
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(CE)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING BONDING FOR BROWNFIELDS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
16-Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) For the purposes described in subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the aggregate one hundred thirty million dollars, provided twenty-five million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2012; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2013; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2014; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2015; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2016; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2017; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2018; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2019; and ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2020.
28+Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) For the purposes described in subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the power, from time to time, to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the aggregate one hundred million dollars, provided ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2011; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2012; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2013; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2014; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2015; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2016; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2017; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2018; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2019; and ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2020.
1729
18-(b) The proceeds of the sale of said bonds, to the extent of the amount stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Department of Economic and Community Development for the purpose of providing funding to the Office of Brownfield Remediation and Development established pursuant to section 32-9cc of the general statutes to fund projects prioritized on the state-wide inventory developed pursuant to section 32-9cc of the general statutes, as amended by this act.
30+(b) The proceeds of the sale of said bonds, to the extent of the amount stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Department of Economic and Community Development for the purpose of providing funding to the Office of Brownfield Remediation and Development established pursuant to section 32-9cc of the general statutes to fund projects prioritized on the state-wide inventory developed pursuant to section 2 of this act.
1931
2032 (c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise of any right or power granted thereby, which are not inconsistent with the provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this section, and temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in accordance with said section 3-20 and from time to time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond Commission authorizing such bonds. None of said bonds shall be authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that there has been filed with it a request for such authorization which is signed by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its discretion, may require. Said bonds issued pursuant to this section shall be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and interest on said bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as part of the contract of the state with the holders of said bonds, appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay such principal and interest as the same become due.
2133
2234 Sec. 2. Subsection (b) of section 32-9cc of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011):
2335
2436 (b) The office shall:
2537
2638 (1) Develop procedures and policies for streamlining the process for brownfield remediation and development;
2739
2840 (2) Identify existing and potential sources of funding for brownfield remediation and develop procedures for expediting the application for and release of such funds;
2941
3042 (3) Establish an office to provide assistance and information concerning the state's technical assistance, funding, regulatory and permitting programs;
3143
3244 (4) Provide a single point of contact for financial and technical assistance from the state and quasi-public agencies;
3345
34-(5) Develop a common application to be used by all state and quasi-public entities providing financial assistance for brownfield assessment, remediation and development; [and]
46+(5) Develop a common application to be used by all state and quasi-public entities providing financial assistance for brownfield assessment, remediation and development; and
3547
3648 (6) [Identify] Develop and prioritize a state-wide inventory of brownfield development opportunities, using priority criteria that includes, but is not limited to, economic development viability, geographic diversity and environmental urgency; and
3749
3850 (7) Develop and execute a communication and outreach program to educate municipalities, economic development agencies, property owners and potential property owners and other organizations and individuals with regard to state policies and procedures for brownfield remediation.
3951
4052
4153
4254
4355 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4456 Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section
4557 Sec. 2 July 1, 2011 32-9cc(b)
4658
4759 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4860
4961 Section 1
5062
5163 July 1, 2011
5264
5365 New section
5466
5567 Sec. 2
5668
5769 July 1, 2011
5870
5971 32-9cc(b)
6072
73+Statement of Purpose:
6174
75+To ensure that the Office of Brownfield Remediation and Development has adequate funding.
6276
63-CE Joint Favorable Subst.
64-
65-CE
66-
67-Joint Favorable Subst.
77+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]