LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06540
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06540
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06540
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 2, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 1, 2011
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
June 3, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 26, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 18, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 5, 2011
Compare