05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/03/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/02/2011 | Public Act 11-2 | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 335 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/30/2011 | File Number 289 | |||
03/30/2011 | House Calendar Number 185 | |||
03/30/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/30/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/07/2011 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |||
03/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |