04/29/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/29/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 522 | |||
04/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 315 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/07/2011 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |||
03/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |