04/06/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/05/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
04/01/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |