05/03/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
05/03/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/20/2011 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 412 | |||
04/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 259 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |