|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-210
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
File Number 902
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 639
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7973
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8046
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
File Number 655
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 384
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|