|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-145
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
File Number 829
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 528
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6444
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
File Number 585
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
House Calendar Number 346
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|