06/02/2011 | File Number 888 | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 599 | |||
06/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
06/01/2011 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
06/01/2011 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/01/2011 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8030 | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 657 | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 386 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/30 | |||
03/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |