|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 652
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6737
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 770
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 462
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute APP
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|