|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-214
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 641
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
File Number 700
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 434
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/30
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|