|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-149
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
File Number 854
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6671
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 623
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
House Calendar Number 371
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 04/01
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|