05/03/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/02/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 556 | |||
04/18/2011 | House Calendar Number 342 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/17/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |