04/20/2011 | File Number 589 | |||
04/20/2011 | House Calendar Number 357 | |||
04/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/04/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/17/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |