05/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 583 | |||
05/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/26/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 680 | |||
05/02/2011 | House Calendar Number 416 | |||
05/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |