04/13/2011 | File Number 524 | |||
04/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 317 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |