07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/21/2011 | Public Act 11-151 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/13/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 500 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/11/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/03/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/19/2011 | File Number 586 | |||
04/19/2011 | House Calendar Number 347 | |||
04/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/21/2011 | Public Hearing 03/25 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |