07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/21/2011 | Public Act 11-156 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 559 | |||
05/26/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/24/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/18/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/18/2011 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
05/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 682 | |||
05/02/2011 | House Calendar Number 418 | |||
05/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/28/2011 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |