05/24/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/24/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/23/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/17/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 705 | |||
05/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 440 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/28/2011 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |