|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-157
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
File Number 799
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5890
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
File Number 619
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
House Calendar Number 364
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 04/01
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|