|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-158
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 890
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 604
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7959
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
File Number 683
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
House Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Public Hearing 04/04
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|