05/09/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 477 | |||
05/09/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/27/2011 | File Number 643 | |||
04/27/2011 | House Calendar Number 378 | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/13/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/04/2011 | Public Hearing 04/08 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |