|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
File Number 723
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 440
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|