|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-67
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
House Calendar Number 537
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 6646
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 6097
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule C 6097
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5943
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4992
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
File Number 55
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 71
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
Public Hearing 01/27
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|