05/04/2011 | Motion Failed JF | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/01/2011 | File Number 14 | |||
03/01/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 44 | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/01/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/19/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/18/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/14/2011 | Vote to Draft |