04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
02/22/2011 | File Number 10 | |||
02/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 38 | |||
02/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
02/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/22/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/08/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
01/21/2011 | Public Hearing 01/25 | |||
01/19/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/18/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/14/2011 | Vote to Draft |