05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 301 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 205 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/21/2011 | Public Hearing 01/25 | |||
01/19/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/18/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/14/2011 | Vote to Draft |