LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00017
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00017
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00017
Action History
02/08/2011
Motion Failed JF
01/28/2011
Public Hearing 02/03
01/19/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
01/18/2011
Drafted by Committee
01/14/2011
Vote to Draft