|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-172
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 571
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6727
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
File Number 801
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/16/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
File Number 15
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 45
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|