04/27/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/27/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/15/2011 | House Calendar Number 324 | |||
04/15/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 302 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 206 | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/19/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/18/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/14/2011 | Vote to Draft |