05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 539 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/14/2011 | File Number 56 | |||
03/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 78 | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
01/31/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/18/2011 | Vote to Draft |