|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-220
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
House Calendar Number 507
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6297
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5526
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
File Number 601
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 366
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|