04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 498 | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 300 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/21/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
01/19/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |