04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 116 | |||
03/21/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 110 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |||
02/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/15/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 |