04/06/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 154 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 139 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |||
03/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/24/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 |