02/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |||
02/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
02/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
01/31/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/18/2011 | Vote to Draft |