04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 254 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 181 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
01/24/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/20/2011 | Vote to Draft LAB |