LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00099
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00099
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00099
Action History
03/17/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
03/16/2011
Drafted by Committee
02/15/2011
Vote to Draft
01/28/2011
Public Hearing 02/03
01/20/2011
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing