04/07/2011 | File Number 438 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 259 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
02/23/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/20/2011 | Vote to Draft |