03/04/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/04/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
01/25/2011 | Drafted by Committee |