|
06/06/2011
|
House Calendar Number 626
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8464
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
File Number 577
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 359
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|