03/14/2011 | File Number 57 | |||
03/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 70 | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/28/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
01/27/2011 | Drafted by Committee |