06/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 584 | |||
06/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/02/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 499 | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 299 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | |||
02/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/01/2011 | Vote to Draft |