05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 556 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6977 | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 117 | |||
03/21/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 111 | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |||
02/28/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/24/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 |