05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/14/2011 | File Number 528 | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 317 | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/25/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/18/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
03/03/2011 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
01/24/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |