|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-160
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 488
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
File Number 529
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 318
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|