18 | | - | (b) The task force shall consist of the following members: |
---|
| 30 | + | (a) Not later than September 1, 2003, and annually thereafter, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall (1) determine the amount appropriated for the following purposes: (A) To purchase, store and distribute vaccines for routine immunizations included in the schedule for active immunization required by section 19a-7f; (B) to purchase, store and distribute (i) vaccines to prevent hepatitis A and B in persons of all ages, as recommended by the schedule for immunizations published by the National Advisory Committee for Immunization Practices, (ii) antibiotics necessary for the treatment of tuberculosis and biologics and antibiotics necessary for the detection and treatment of tuberculosis infections, and (iii) antibiotics to support treatment of patients in communicable disease control clinics, as defined in section 19a-216a; and (C) to provide services needed to collect up-to-date information on childhood immunizations for all children enrolled in Medicaid who reach two years of age during the year preceding the current fiscal year, to incorporate such information into the childhood immunization registry, as defined in section 19a-7h, and (2) inform the Insurance Commissioner of such amount. |
---|
20 | | - | (1) Two representatives of the pharmaceutical industry, one each appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro tempore of the Senate; |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) Each domestic insurer or health care center doing life insurance or health insurance business in this state shall annually pay to the Insurance Commissioner, for deposit in the [General Fund] account established in subsection (e) of this section, a health and welfare fee assessed by the Insurance Commissioner pursuant to this section. Not later than October 1, 2003, the Insurance Commissioner shall determine the fee to be assessed against each such domestic insurer or health care center for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2004. Not later than October 1, 2003, and annually thereafter, the Insurance Commissioner shall determine the fee to be assessed against each such domestic insurer or health care center for the next fiscal year. Such fee shall be a percentage of the total amount appropriated, as identified in subsection (a) of this section, and shall be calculated on the basis of life insurance premiums and health insurance premiums and subscriber charges in the same manner as calculations under section 38a-48. Not later than November 1, 2003, and annually thereafter, the Insurance Commissioner shall submit a statement to each such insurer and health care center that includes the proposed fee for the insurer or health care center calculated in accordance with this section. As used in this section, "health insurance" means health insurance, as defined in subdivisions (1) to (13), inclusive, of section 38a-469. |
---|
26 | | - | (4) The chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health; |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | (5) The chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services; |
---|
29 | | - | |
---|
30 | | - | (6) The chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to appropriations and the budgets of state agencies; |
---|
31 | | - | |
---|
32 | | - | (7) The chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to insurance; |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | (8) The Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's designee; |
---|
35 | | - | |
---|
36 | | - | (9) The Commissioner of Insurance, or the commissioner's designee; |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | (10) The Commissioner of Social Services, or the commissioner's designee; |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | (11) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, or the secretary's designee; and |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | (12) An employee of the Department of Public Health, appointed by the Commissioner of Public Health, responsible for immunizations. |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | (c) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy of an appointed membership shall be filled by the appointing authority. |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | (d) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force, from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than sixty days after the effective date of this section. |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | (e) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health and the staff of the Office of Legislative Research shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | (f) Not later than February 1, 2012, the task force shall submit a report on its findings and recommendations, including recommendations for legislation, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, human services, appropriations and the budgets of state agencies and insurance, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or February 1, 2012, whichever is later. |
---|
| 38 | + | (e) There is established an account to be known as the "health and welfare fee account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain the fee paid by each domestic insurer or health care center in accordance with subsection (b) of this section and any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management for the purposes of subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of this section. |
---|